U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • August 22, 2022: [Return of Passport]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [USM Return Unexecuted]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • November 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: [Continue ]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [USM Return Unexecuted]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 15, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 22, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 10, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • November 03, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 26, 2016: [Payment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 03, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • June 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 21, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Extension of Time]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 08, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • December 08, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2015: [Witness List]
  • December 02, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 02, 2015: [Court Exhibits]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • December 01, 2015: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 01, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 23, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • November 19, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 19, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • November 18, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 17, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 16, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 13, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 12, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 10, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • November 09, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Witness List]
  • November 05, 2015: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • November 05, 2015: [Jury Selection]
  • November 03, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Witness List]
  • October 28, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 28, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 28, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • October 28, 2015: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 26, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • October 26, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • October 26, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • October 25, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 25, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 20, 2015: [Travel ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • October 01, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Transcript]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2015
  • January 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.