U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baddeley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [USM Return Unexecuted]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 18, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Quash ]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 22, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 18, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2015
  • January 21, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.