U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 10, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 20, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 04, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
January, 2015
  • January 23, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.