U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:97-cr-00204-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Feliciano, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • September 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [USCA Request]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • June 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • December 07, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 04, 2020: [Vacate ]
  • December 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 02, 2020: [Transcript]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 20, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 19, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 18, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 12, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 10, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 05, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 05, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • October 16, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extension of Time]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2020: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2020: [Extension of Time]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 28, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 28, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [USCA Request]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel re Crack Cocaine]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2015
  • January 23, 2015: [USCA Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.