U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tisdol
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • February 12, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 20, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • December 18, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • December 18, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2015
  • January 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.