U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lminggio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 06, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • September 06, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
January, 2015
  • January 28, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.