U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 16, 2019: [Violation Report]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 04, 2019: [Hearing ]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Hearing ]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2015
  • January 28, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.