U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera-Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 05, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • February 14, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 04, 2021: [Violation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 25, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 03, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 10, 2019: [Continue ]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue ]
September, 2018
  • September 23, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 16, 2018: [Sealed Document]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 25, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 27, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 27, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 26, 2017: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • September 26, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 22, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • September 20, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 19, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 18, 2017: [Preclude]
  • September 17, 2017: [Trial Memo]
  • September 16, 2017: [In Limine ]
  • September 15, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 14, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 13, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 11, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • September 07, 2017: [Jury Selection]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [ExParte Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Witness List]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2017: [Witness List]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 09, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Compel ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 11, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 25, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 22, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 28, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 23, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 14, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 08, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 11, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • February 02, 2016: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • February 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 11, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Indictment]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 14, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 14, 2015: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 12, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 24, 2015: [Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • July 24, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 24, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 24, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 24, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 24, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • July 24, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 24, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2015
  • January 29, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.