U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • January 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 14, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 13, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 26, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 26, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2016: [Transcript]
March, 2016
  • March 20, 2016: [Transcript]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.