U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cornish
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Restitution Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2021: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 08, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.