U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Recck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Payment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
February, 2015
  • February 06, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.