U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 28, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 08, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 25, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 07, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 07, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2015
  • February 06, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.