U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snape
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 07, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 06, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice]
February, 2015
  • February 08, 2015: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.