U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mazza et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 30, 2020: [Reply to Response]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2019: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 01, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 23, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 23, 2017: [Seal]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 16, 2016: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Sealed Document]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 08, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order Returning Submission]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 29, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 28, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
February, 2015
  • February 09, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.