U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davila-Bermudez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2015
  • February 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.