U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 06, 2023: [Violation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • November 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 05, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 11, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 09, 2021: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 26, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 19, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2015
  • April 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2015
  • February 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.