U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chibuko
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.