U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:92-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCarthy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 03, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 27, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 20, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 20, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 18, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 14, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 27, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • December 02, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Reply to Response]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order Returning Submission]
  • November 04, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Leave to File]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2015: [Transcript]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [USCA Request]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.