U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 19, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 10, 2017: [Violation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • January 04, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 21, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.