U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lillemoe et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 26, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Travel ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 23, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Clerk's Disbursement of Funds]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • May 25, 2021: [Vacate ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • March 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 09, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 09, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 12, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 05, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 28, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 26, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice]
  • November 02, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Passport Returned]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Extension of Time]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 28, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Appearance Pro Se]
  • January 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2017: [Extension of Time]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2017: [Receipt for Passport]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 14, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • September 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 11, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 29, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 18, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 21, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 21, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order]
  • July 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2017: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • July 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 02, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 02, 2017: [Seal]
  • June 01, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2017: [Seal]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 11, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 03, 2017: [Exhibit List]
March, 2017
  • March 26, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 21, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • March 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 13, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 09, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 09, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • March 07, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 06, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 02, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 02, 2017: [Seal]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • February 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Conference]
  • February 10, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 10, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Acquittal]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 30, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • November 09, 2016: [Jury Verdict]
  • November 09, 2016: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • November 09, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • November 08, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • November 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 07, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • November 03, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • November 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • November 02, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • November 01, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 30, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 30, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 29, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • October 27, 2016: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 26, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 26, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 25, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 24, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 24, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 24, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • October 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Directed Verdict]
  • October 21, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 20, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 19, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Directed Verdict]
  • October 19, 2016: [Directed Verdict]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 18, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 17, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • October 17, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 16, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 14, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 13, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 13, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 09, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • October 08, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • October 07, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 06, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 05, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • October 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 01, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • September 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
  • September 30, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 28, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 28, 2016: [Joinder ]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • September 22, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • September 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 21, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • September 14, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • September 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • September 14, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 08, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Transcript]
  • September 08, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 07, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 06, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • September 02, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Preclude]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • August 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • August 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 26, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 15, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • June 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 15, 2016: [Compel ]
  • June 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Compel ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 08, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [Quash ]
  • May 27, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Quash ]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Quash ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 25, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Compel ]
  • February 26, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • February 26, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • February 26, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 11, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2015: [Transcript]
  • October 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2015
  • February 25, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.