U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frank et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 14, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2022: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • November 18, 2022: [Instrument Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Dismiss ]
  • February 21, 2020: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 10, 2019: [Continue ]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 12, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continue ]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continue ]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continue ]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 16, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Continue ]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 01, 2018: [Seal]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Continue ]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue ]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 26, 2018: [Seal]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2018: [Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Transcript]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 17, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Incur Expenses]
  • November 07, 2017: [Incur Expenses (Sealed)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Extension of Time]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 26, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • May 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [New Trial]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 31, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2016: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • August 05, 2016: [Jury Verdict]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • August 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • August 05, 2016: [Acquittal]
  • August 05, 2016: [New Trial]
  • August 05, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • August 05, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 05, 2016: [Witness List]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • August 03, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • August 03, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • August 02, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 02, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • August 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
July, 2016
  • July 31, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 31, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • July 28, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • July 28, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • July 27, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 24, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • July 24, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • July 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 21, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 19, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • July 19, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 19, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • July 06, 2016: [Compel ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 18, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 14, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • June 09, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • June 08, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 28, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • April 13, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 12, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2016: [Preclude]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 15, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • March 11, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 11, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 22, 2016: [Preclude]
  • February 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 05, 2016: [Letter]
  • February 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 05, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 13, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Unseal Document]
  • October 26, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order]
  • October 02, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2015
  • February 25, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.