U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 06, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arrest ]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 16, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2015
  • February 25, 2015: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.