U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 07, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 02, 2016: [Violation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Extension of Time]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2015: [Extension of Time]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 27, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 27, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 05, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
March, 2015
  • March 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.