U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:94-cr-00223-42
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Copy]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • March 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 23, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • February 01, 2022: [Seal]
  • February 01, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 10, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • October 01, 2021: [Seal]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 27, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • September 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • August 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2021: [Seal]
  • August 20, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 22, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • June 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 18, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 14, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 23, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
  • April 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
  • April 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 22, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 05, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • April 04, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Acknowledged Receipt of ROA]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • October 24, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 24, 2018: [USCA Request]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • September 25, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 21, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
April, 2015
  • April 30, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
March, 2015
  • March 10, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.