U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Earley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 04, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Vacate ]
  • March 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 17, 2016: [Vacate ]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • December 04, 2015: [Suppress]
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Affidavit]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Suppress]
  • August 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Withdraw]
March, 2015
  • March 03, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.