U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 13, 2020: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 22, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2015
  • March 05, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.