U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 20, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 14, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 24, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 12, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 11, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2015
  • March 06, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.