U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glossian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Writ Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 11, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 30, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • January 29, 2020: [Application for Writ]
  • January 29, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 27, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 27, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 27, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 27, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 27, 2017: [Violation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 06, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 13, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 12, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 09, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 06, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2015
  • March 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.