U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Katke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Continue ]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 30, 2016: [Bond]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 16, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2015: [Extension of Time]
March, 2015
  • March 13, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.