U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 02, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Seal]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Seal]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 07, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Seal]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
March, 2015
  • March 13, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.