U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00227-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Preston et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 23, 2022: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 22, 2022: [Bond]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 13, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 18, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 18, 2021: [Violation Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2015
  • March 17, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.