U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martocci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 21, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 14, 2017: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 11, 2017: [Violation Report]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 15, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 05, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 28, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 28, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2017: [Arrest ]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 04, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2015
  • March 19, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.