U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Athan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • December 05, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 19, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • August 18, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 30, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 30, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 26, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Continue ]
March, 2015
  • March 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.