U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simpson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 14, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 03, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 24, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 23, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • June 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 24, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2015: [Continue ]
April, 2015
  • April 01, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.