U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duncan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • April 18, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2015
  • April 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.