U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 25, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • November 23, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • November 13, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 29, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 19, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2015
  • April 14, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • April 07, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.