U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sabato et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 17, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 05, 2022: [Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • May 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 03, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2021: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 23, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 21, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 09, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 26, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Bond]
  • February 12, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • February 12, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • December 04, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 02, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 20, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 19, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • November 13, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 03, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 02, 2015: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2015
  • October 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2015: [Strike ]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Leave to File]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 26, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 24, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2015: [In Limine ]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 04, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 07, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • July 07, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
April, 2015
  • April 08, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.