U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zamani
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Travel ]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Travel ]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2016: [Travel ]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 29, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • June 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 15, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 05, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 05, 2015: [Departure]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 24, 2015: [Sealed Document]
April, 2015
  • April 16, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.