U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 20, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 20, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • July 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 19, 2015: [Continue ]
April, 2015
  • April 17, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.