U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bruce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 19, 2016: [Payment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • October 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 16, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2015
  • April 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.