U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:91-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santana et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • May 26, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 24, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2015
  • April 24, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.