U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deutsche Bank AG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 24, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2018: [Dismiss ]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Certificate of Good Standing]
April, 2015
  • April 26, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.