U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Le
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 05, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Continue ]
April, 2015
  • April 29, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.