U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 21, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 07, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 31, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 27, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 07, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Witness List]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 15, 2015: [Appear]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • September 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Suppress]
  • August 26, 2015: [Seal]
  • August 26, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 26, 2015: [Sealed Document]
April, 2015
  • April 30, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.