U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gentile
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 09, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 09, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • February 22, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Copy]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam ]
  • September 21, 2017: [Medical Exam ]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 05, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 05, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • September 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 31, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 30, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • August 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 22, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 18, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 06, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • April 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2017: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order Referring Plea]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Incur Expenses (Sealed)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 07, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 06, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 06, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Status Conference]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 04, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Status Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2016: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Copy]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 02, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 02, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 12, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • February 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Disclosure ]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 23, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Disclosure ]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 16, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 16, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • September 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2015: [Seal]
  • September 02, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 16, 2015: [Continue ]
May, 2015
  • May 01, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.