U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Katsetos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 12, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 05, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 04, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 02, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 02, 2015: [Seal]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 01, 2015: [Travel ]
May, 2015
  • May 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.