U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Document]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 25, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 13, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 30, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 17, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2015
  • May 08, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.