U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00070-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Santucci et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 13, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 06, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • January 08, 2018: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 30, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 30, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 20, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2017: [Continue ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 29, 2017: [Bond]
  • September 29, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 07, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Dismiss ]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • August 22, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Bond]
  • July 28, 2017: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Departure]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • October 06, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • September 27, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 16, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Witness List]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 09, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 30, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • May 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 24, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 29, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 26, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • January 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 26, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • January 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 07, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 04, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 30, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 30, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 30, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 23, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 23, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • December 23, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 23, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • December 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 22, 2015: [Giglio Material]
  • December 22, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • December 22, 2015: [Suppress]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • December 17, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 11, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 11, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 11, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 04, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 18, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 31, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 16, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 16, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 16, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 14, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 09, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 09, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 09, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 05, 2015: [Status Conference]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • September 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 24, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 14, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 08, 2015: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 08, 2015: [Bill of Particulars]
  • September 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2015: [Disclosure ]
  • September 02, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 24, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 11, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2015: [Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 19, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 18, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2015
  • May 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.