U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 23, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 27, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2016: [Extension of Time]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • February 03, 2016: [Discovery]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 04, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 04, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.