U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crawford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
May, 2016
  • May 14, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 15, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 09, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.